MA S1802 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide better notices and protections in the process for collecting delinquent property taxes. Revenue.
Title
Relative to providing better notices and protections in the process for collecting delinquent property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5247 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3026 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4936
S1887 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H3094 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1961 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1836 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1824 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1887 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1975 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H3094 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1961 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1836 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1824 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1802 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1802.pdf |