MA S2988 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to forfeiture reform (being the text of Senate, No. 2944, printed as amended).
Title
Relative to forfeiture reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-07 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #194 (Yeas 31 to Nays 9) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Text of S2944, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S965 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
H1757 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
S2671 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
S2944 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2988
H1757 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
S2671 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
S2944 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2988
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2988 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2988.pdf |