MA H3016 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring school bus monitors on school buses transporting students in kindergarten through grade five. Transportation.
Title
Requiring school bus monitors on school buses transporting students in kindergarten through grade five
Sponsors
Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4546 |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1356 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2984 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2113 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2102 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
S1397 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2088 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1448 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3072 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2034 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H2984 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2113 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2102 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
S1397 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2088 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1448 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3072 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2034 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2113
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3016 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3016.pdf |