MA H2967 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to allowing for certain tax deductions of business interest. Revenue.
Title
Allowing for the deduction of business interest
Sponsors
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. David Muradian [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-04-07 | House | Accompanied by S1935 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1935 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2967
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2914 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1805 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2987
S1922 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
H3014 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2914 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1805 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2987
S1922 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
H3014 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2967 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2967.pdf |