MA S1922 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the commuter tax deduction to reflect rising costs. Revenue.
Title
To increase the commuter tax deduction to reflect rising costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4562 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2932 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1805 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2987
S1873 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
S1935 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2967
H4562 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1805 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2987
S1873 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
S1935 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2967
H4562 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1922.pdf |