MA H3014 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide an income tax deduction for purchases of gun safes. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to gun safe deductions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-12-03JointHearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2987 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
S1805 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2987

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback