MA H2928 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4526
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kocot of Northampton, a petition of Peter V. Kocot for the establishment of product stewardship programs to provide free-of-charge recycling when products are sold or discarded. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To create a framework to re-allocate responsibility for discarded products
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4526 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S182 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1188 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H1708 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H165 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S1576 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3998
S416 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H452 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H26 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4526 (Replaced by) 2018-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1188 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H1708 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H165 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S1576 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3998
S416 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H452 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H26 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4526 (Replaced by) 2018-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2928 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2928.pdf |