MA H2928 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to art in public spaces. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Resolve establishing a commission to study art in public spaces
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-11-25 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2928 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2928.pdf |