MA H2875 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5200
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to income tax credits for the design and manufacture of video games. Revenue.
Title
Relative to increasing economic development and business opportunity in the design and manufacture of video games through the use of tax credits
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] |
Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5200 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3004 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2898 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1821 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1925 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1985 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H5200 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2898 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1821 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1925 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1985 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H5200 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2875.pdf |