MA S1925 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to economic development tax credits. Revenue.
Title
Relative to economic development tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3004 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1857 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2875 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1925 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1925.pdf |