MA H2865 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act officially making the month of March multiple system atrophy awareness month By Mr. Peterson of Grafton, a petition of George N. Peterson, Jr., Paul K. Frost and Robert L. Hedlund for the issuance by the Governor of an annual proclamation setting apart the month of March as multiple system atrophy awareness month. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Officially making the month of March multiple system atrophy awareness month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-16 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-04-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2865 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2865.pdf |