MA H2854 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the delivery of electricity by generation companies or suppliers through service lines or distribution systems to residential ratepayers who use private lines. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to consumer protection and private utility lines and poles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2854 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2854.pdf |