MA H2811 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4728
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a tax incentive program for micro businesses to hire formerly incarcerated individuals and individuals receiving transitional benefits. Revenue.
Title
To establish the micro business employee training and workforce development program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4728 |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2814 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4720
S2810 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4728 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2810 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4728 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2811 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2811.pdf |