MA S2810 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fusion investment and research for sustainable technology. Revenue.
Title
Relative to fusion investment and research for sustainable technology to be known as the FIRST Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-06-03 | House | House concurred |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Joint Rule 12 suspended |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2810 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2810.pdf |