MA H2806 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish rate options to reduce utility customer costs and lower peak demand. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To establish rate options to reduce customer costs and lower peak demand
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2806.pdf |