MA H2758 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3856
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the town of Sandisfield to continue the employment of employees subject to mandatory retirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Sandisfield to continue the employment of employees subject to mandatory retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3856 |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3856 (Replaced by) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2758 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2758.pdf |