MA H3856 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2758
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Sandisfield to continue the employment of employees subject to mandatory retirement
Title
Authorizing the town of Sandisfield to continue the employment of employees subject to mandatory retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-10-25 | House | Enacted |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-10-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-06-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-01 | House | New draft of H2758 |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2758 (Replaces) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3856
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3856 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3856.pdf |