MA H2754 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to definitions under the emergency medical services system law. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to medical services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-28HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H1072 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H1160 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1723 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1894 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S1312 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred
S1444 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1405 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S607 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1164 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback