MA H1160 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to behavioral health emergency services for MassHealth members. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to behavioral health emergency services
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1159 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1707 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1710 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1735 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1125 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2754 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1120 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S611 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2893
S1152 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2888
H1704 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1164 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S615 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S691 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1707 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1710 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1735 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1125 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2754 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1120 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S611 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2893
S1152 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2888
H1704 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1164 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S615 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S691 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1160 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1160.pdf |