MA S1405 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to medical services. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to medical services
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1259 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1894 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1894 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1405 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1405.pdf |