MA H2719 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit discrimination in state contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination in state contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-11-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3413 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
S1806 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S781 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H1038 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1822 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1858 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S901 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1806 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S781 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H1038 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1822 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1858 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S901 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2719 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2719.pdf |