MA H2694 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-16 - Accompanied S1860
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Farley-Bouvier of Pittsfield, a petition of Tricia Farley-Bouvier and others for an investigation by the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance of the ability to pay for costs associated public safety and security facilities in certain cities. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Resolve establishing a study of public safety & security facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-16 | Senate | Accompanied S1860 |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1860 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1224 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S670 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1224 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H3795 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4157 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2694 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2694.pdf |