MA H2669 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to COVID-19 mandatory vaccinations and immunization passports for public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to employee protections
Sponsors
Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R] |
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4518 |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1166 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2479
S1156 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2479 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - New draft substituted, see S2934
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
S2934 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1156 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2479 (Similar To) 2024-08-08 - New draft substituted, see S2934
H4518 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H3987
S2934 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2669 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2669.pdf |