MA S2479 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1166
Note: Legislation replaced by S2934
Note: Legislation replaced by S2934
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-08 - New draft substituted, see S2934
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-08 - New draft substituted, see S2934
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure domestic violence victims' protections for all employees in the Commonwealth; and of Joseph D. McKenna, Ryan C. Fattman and others relative to employment protections for domestic violence victims, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2479).
Title
Ensuring domestic violence victims' protections for all employees in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-08 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2934 |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Read second |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2934 |
2023-10-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-10-18 | Senate | New draft of S1166 and H1919 |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1166 (Replaces) 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2479
S2934 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2934 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2479 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2479.pdf |