MA S1166 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2479
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure domestic violence victims' protections for all employees in the Commonwealth. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Ensuring domestic violence victims' protections for all employees in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-18 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2479 |
2023-04-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2479 (Replaced by) 2024-08-08 - New draft substituted, see S2934
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1166 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1166.pdf |