MA H2661 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a legislative research bureau within the General Court. Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently.
Title
Creating a legislative research bureau
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Maria Robinson [D] |
Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H2720 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2715 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2663 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H652 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2662 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H3932 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2715 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2663 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H652 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2662 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H3932 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2661 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2661.pdf |