MA H2662 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Mark of Peru, a petition of Paul W. Mark that all meetings or caucuses convened by the General Court for the purposes of considering budget appropriations be open to the public. Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently.
Title
Regarding transparent budgeting
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3799 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - See H3800
H3220 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2720 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H485 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1476 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3801 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied H4000
S2255 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2019
S2271 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - See H3819
H3910 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2019
H3934 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4003 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2019
H2715 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H4132 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Reported, in part, by H4246
S2378 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Reprinted as amended, see S2386
H4128 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Adopted, see H4127
H4246 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Sections returned with disapprovals (see sections 8, 9, 38 and 100) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4252 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - See H4246
H3220 (Similar To) 2020-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2720 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H485 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1476 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3801 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied H4000
S2255 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 21 of the Acts of 2019
S2271 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - See H3819
H3910 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2019
H3934 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4003 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2019
H2715 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H4132 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Reported, in part, by H4246
S2378 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Reprinted as amended, see S2386
H4128 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Adopted, see H4127
H4246 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Sections returned with disapprovals (see sections 8, 9, 38 and 100) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4252 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - See H4246
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2662 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2662.pdf |