MA H2616 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3908
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the cap on the dairy farm tax credit. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the dairy farm tax credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-18HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3908
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H1562 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3858
S1665 (Similar To) 2017-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3319 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3669
S1651 (Similar To) 2017-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3779 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3858 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3908 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback