MA H3908 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the dairy farm tax credit
Title
Relative to the dairy farm tax credit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-09-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-09-18 | House | New draft of H2616 |
2017-09-18 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1562 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3858
H2616 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3908
H3858 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2616 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3908
H3858 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3908 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3908.pdf |