MA H2541 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residency requirements for certain public safety officials in cities and towns. Public Service.
Title
Relative to residency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-08-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-08-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-08-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2541 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2541.pdf |