MA H2523 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kafka of Stoughton, a petition of Louis L. Kafka and James K. Hawkins that cities and towns be authorized to create local rules and procedures allowing persons over the age of 60 to volunteer to provide services in exchange for a reduction in property tax obligations. Revenue.
Title
Relative to reductions in property tax liabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2399 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2505 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1616 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2399 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2505 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1616 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2523 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2523.pdf |