MA H2493 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt the manufacture or sale of weapons from regulation by the Attorney General of the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to weapon regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-11JointHearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2455 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2491 (Similar To) 2022-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4869
S1811 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1703 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback