MA H2480 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create uniform standards in use of force, increase transparency, and reduce harm in correctional facilities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create uniform standards in use of force, increase transparency, and reduce harm in correctional facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H1460 (Similar To) 2021-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1389 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1557 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1543 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1296 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1598 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1541 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback