MA S1296 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to consistent care for addiction rooted in evidence. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Regarding consistent care for addiction rooted in evidence
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H2363 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1281 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S1411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S696 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S335 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3796 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4814
S1259 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
H4814 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
H1191 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1281 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S1411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S696 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S335 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2695 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3796 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4814
S1259 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
H4814 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
H1191 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1296 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1296.pdf |