MA S1411 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to patient notification of medications. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to patient notification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/28/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2363 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1281 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1304 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback