MA H3796 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4814
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to patient assessment and notification prior to prescribing certain medications. Public Health.
Title
Relative to patient assessment and notification prior to prescribing certain medications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4814 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S1296 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1259 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
H2071 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H4814 (Replaced by) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
S1296 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1259 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see S2995
H2071 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H4814 (Replaced by) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5281
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3796.pdf |