CA AB2046 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 373, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 232.2, 232.4, and 232.6 of the Education Code, relating to educational programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational programs: single gender schools and classes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2046 Bryan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2046 Bryan By Bradford (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Assembly - AB 2046 Bryan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 373, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-05 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.).
2024-08-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2024-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2024-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.).
2024-08-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-05SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2024-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-06SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-06-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 5).
2024-05-29SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2024-05-01SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2024-04-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-04-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
2024-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2024-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2024-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2024-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2024-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code232.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code232.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code232.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback