MA S1557 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2763
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to medical examinations in correctional facilities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to medical examinations in correctional facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2763 |
2021-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2763 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S655 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S655 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1557 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1557.pdf |