MA H2429 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing critical incident intervention services for emergency service providers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to critical incident intervention by emergency service providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2307 (Similar To) 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5444
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2429 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2429.pdf |