MA H2307 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5444
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5444
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pre-hospital care protocols and point-of-entry plans related to the assessment, treatment and transport of stroke patients by licensed emergency medical services' providers. Public Health.
Title
Relative to timely care and saving lives
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5444 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
H2429 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H2253 (Similar To) 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5441
H5444 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2429 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H2253 (Similar To) 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5441
H5444 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2307 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2307.pdf |