MA H2422 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 475 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 475 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to injured on duty benefits for environmental police officers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to injured on duty benefits for environmental police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 475 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-06-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-09 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2013-10-07 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2013-07-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-02-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2422 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2422.pdf |