MA H2374 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Chatham be exempt from complying with certain labor law requirements. Labor and Workforce Development. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the prevailing wage in the town of Chatham
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H2635 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3909
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S995 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H3909 (Similar To) 2018-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2018
H4111 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2635 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3909
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S995 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H3909 (Similar To) 2018-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2018
H4111 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2374 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2374.pdf |