MA H2363 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3825

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to collective bargaining representation for public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to collective bargaining representation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3825
2019-04-19JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-03-25SenateSenate concurred
2019-03-21HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1544 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1543 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2196 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2197 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2680 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H3825 (Replaced by) 2019-06-05 - New draft substituted, see H3854
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
H3854 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback