MA H2346 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the right to counsel in guardianship proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the right to counsel in guardianship proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H1426 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H751 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S963 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1672 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1673 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H968 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3589 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1426 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H751 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S963 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H1672 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1673 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H968 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3589 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2346 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2346.pdf |