MA H1672 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4481

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit members of the General Court from directly or indirectly receiving or requesting compensation from anyone in relation to Committee for Public Counsel Services duties. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Committee for Public Counsel Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4481
2017-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/23/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H1673 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H1426 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1551 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback