MA H3589 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Rogers of Cambridge, a petition of David M. Rogers and others establishing a right to counsel in certain eviction cases. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a right to counsel in certain eviction cases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied H1426
H1426 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1672 (Similar To) 2017-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1673 (Similar To) 2017-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback