MA H234 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5261
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the closing of community service offices. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To protect safety net access for Massachusetts residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5261 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S102 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2657
H217 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2662 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2661 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
S108 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S141 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S134 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2914
S112 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5261 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H217 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2662 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2661 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5319
S108 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S141 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S134 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2914
S112 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5261 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H234 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H234.pdf |