MA S134 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2914
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2914
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2914
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect safety net access for Massachusetts residents. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Protecting safety net access for Massachusetts residents
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] | Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2914 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-27 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S192 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied S211
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S484 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1571 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S629 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S2914 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H691 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2500 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4120 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
H1749 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S484 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1346 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1571 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S629 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S2914 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H691 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S134 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S134.pdf |