MA H2314 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include public works employees for killed-in-the-line-of-duty benefits. Public Service.
Title
Relative to public safety employee death benefits
Sponsors
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
Rep. Russell Holmes [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2264 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2286 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
S879 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1575 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
H2286 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
S1508 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2332
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
S879 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1575 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2314 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2314.pdf |