MA H2236 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits of special investigators of the Alcohol Beverage Control Commission. Public Service.
Title
Relative to special investigators of the alcohol beverage control commission
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H51 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1506 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3153 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H51 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1506 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1480 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2236 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2236.pdf |